## Tuesday, 12 June 2012 0 comments

Genius Math Short cuts that amaze your friends

nature is the realisation of the simplestconceivable mathematical ideas.

-EINSTEIN

These are the some math shortcuts which increase the performance of brain cells and also make you smart when you use these techniques in your daily life

Use the formula ALL FROM 9 AND THE LAST FROM 10 to amaze your friends with

instant sub-tractions.

For example 1000 - 357 = 643
We simply take each figure in 357 from 9 and the last figure from 10:
So the answer is 1000 - 357 = 643

And that’s all there is to it!

This always works for subtractions from numbers consisting of a 1 followed by

noughts: 100; 1000; 10,000 etc.

Similarly 10,000 - 1049 = 8951
For 1000 - 83, in which we have more zeros than figures in the numbers being subtracted, we simply suppose that 83 is 083.

So 1000 - 83 becomes 1000 - 083 = 917

Try some yourself:
1) 1000 - 283 =
2) 10,000 - 2345 =
3) 10,000 - 1101 =
4) 1000 - 57 =
5) 10,000 - 38 =

Ssuppose you buy something for Rs/-3.33 and you give a Rs/-10 note. How much

cchange would you expect to Get? You just apply ALL FROM 9 AND THE LAST

FROM 10 to the rs/-3.33 and you get rs/-6.67:
Rs.10 – Rs.2.30 = Rs.7.70
Here “the last” is the 3 as zero does not count. So we take 2 from 9 and 3 from 10.

Try these: 1) \$10 - \$7.77 =
3) \$10 - \$6.36 =
5) \$100 - \$84.24 =

Don’t know your tables? Never mind, in this system you don’t need them beyond 5 x5!

Suppose you need 8 x 7

8 is 2 below 10 and 7 is 3 below 10.Think of it like this:

The diagram below shows how you get it.
You subtract crosswise: 8 - 3 or 7 - 2 to get 5, the first figure of the answer.

And you multiply vertically: 2 x 3 to get 6, the last figure of the answer.

At a party surprise your friends with this spectacular way of multiplying large

Here’s how to use VERTICALLY AND CROSS- WISE for multiplying numbers close to 100.
Suppose you want to multiply 88 by 98.
Not easy, you might think. But with VERTICALLY AND CROSSWISE you can give the answer immediately
Both 88 and 98 are close to 100.
88 is 12 below 100 and 98 is 2 below 100.
You can imagine the sum set out like this:
As before the 86 comes from subtractingcrosswise: 88 - 2 = 86 (or
98 - 12 = 86: you can subtract

either way, you will always get the same answer). And the

just 12 x 2: you multiply vertically.

So 88 x 98 = 8624

While waiting in a queue, why not exercise your brain cells

by multiplying numbers just over 100.

103 x 104 = 10712

The answer is in two parts: 107 and 12. 107 is just 103 + 4 (or 104 + 3), and 12 is just 3 x 4.

Similarly 107 x 106 = 11342

107 + 6 = 113 and 7 x 6 = 42
Try a few:

1) 102 x 107

3) 104 x 104

5) 101 x 123

Multiplying a number by 11 is incredibly easy –astonish

your parents and friends with this.

To multiply any 2-figure number by 11 we just put the total of the two figures between the 2 figures.

26 x 11 = 286
Notice that the outer figures in 286 are the 26 being multiplied.

And the middle figure is just 2 and 6 added up.

So 72 x 11 = 792

Multiply by 11:

1) 43  2)81   3)15   4) 44    5) 11

77 x 11 = 847

This involves a carry figure because 7 + 7 = 14

We get 77 x 11 = 7147 = 847.

234 x 11 = 2574

We put the 2 and the 4 at the ends.

We add the first pair: 2 + 3 = 5,

and we add the last pair: 3 + 4 = 7.

On seeing this kind of work actually being performed by the

little children, the doctors, professors and other “big guns”

of mathematics are wonder-struck and exclaim:

‘Is this mathematics or magic?’ And we invariably answer

and say: ‘It is both. It is magic until you understand it; and it is

mathematics thereafter’
-Bharati Krsna Tirthaji

Follow more upcoming mathematics shortcuts that increase the performance of your brain cells and we will update with more shortcuts in psychtronics if this post response is good.

This is part one you will find part 2 here